MAK Development LLC et al v. City of Lincoln, Nebraska et al
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Susan M Bazis |
Referred: | Jacqueline M Deluca |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-03069 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:3601 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 2:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
City of Lincoln, Nebraska
|
|
Defendant
Lincoln-Lancaster County Planning Commission
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Corrado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MAK Development LLC
A Nebraska Limited Liability Company 2648 Washington
Lincoln, NE 68502 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
oth_doc
Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1
Thu 04/18 4:48 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Michelle Faron on behalf of Plaintiff MAK Development LLC.(Faron, Michelle) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 12:17 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice11 for attorney Sarah Jane Hunt. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO) |
|
11 | 11
oth_doc
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 9:28 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5073057 by Attorney Sarah Jane Hunt on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Corrado, MAK Development LLC.(Hunt, Sarah Jane) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/16 11:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Lincoln-Lancaster County Planning Commission defendant All Plaintiffs. (Faron, Michelle) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/16 11:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon City of Lincoln NE defendant All Plaintiffs. (Faron, Michelle) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Attorney Letter
Thu 04/11 2:27 PM
ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michelle Faron has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES) |
|
7 | 7
oth_evt
Attorney Letter
Thu 04/11 2:26 PM
ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Sarah Jane Hunt has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 2:21 PM
Summons Issued as to defendants City of Lincoln, Nebraska, Lincoln-Lancaster County Planning Commission. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/11 2:16 PM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff MAK Development LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (JES) |
|
4 | 4
oth_evt
Assignment of Judges
Thu 04/11 2:14 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Susan M. Bazis and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Requested
Thu 04/11 9:42 AM
Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint,1 . (Martin, Craig) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Requested
Thu 04/11 9:40 AM
Summons Requested as to City of Lincoln, Nebraska regarding Complaint,1 . (Martin, Craig) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 9:37 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against City of Lincoln, Nebraska, Lincoln-Lancaster County Planning Commission ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5066926), by Attorney Craig F. Martin on behalf of MAK Development LLC, a Nebraska Limited Liability Company dba Michael House, and Michael Corrado. an individual(Martin, Craig) |