ExxonMobil Oil Corporation v. JA Dakis Capital LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lorna G Schofield |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-00177 |
Cause | M 98 Miscellaneous Application to File Civil Case Under Seal |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal
Thu 04/18 5:24 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to file a redacted complaint and to file Exhibits 1 and 2 of the complaint under seal is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall follow the sealing instructions in Rule 6.14 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions in initiating a new civil case. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. 1 and to close this case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/18/2024) (mml) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Mon 04/15 5:08 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Myles K. Bartley dated 4/15/2024 re: Sealing Motion. Document filed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation..(Bartley, Myles) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A - Appendix in support of Plaintiff's Sealing Motion | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Miscellaneous Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 12:09 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Bartley, Myles) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Miscellaneous Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 8:48 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Myles Keough Bartley. Attorney must electronically file the Miscellaneous Cover Sheet. Use the event type Miscellaneous Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vba) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/12 8:49 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vba) |
||
notice
Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/12 9:15 AM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. This is a Part I Term Assignment matter..(vba) |
||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal
Fri 04/12 9:17 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CASE UNDER SEAL. Document No. 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to File Case Under Seal . was reviewed and approved as to form. (vba) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Fri 04/12 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (tro) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Leave to File Case Under Seal
Thu 04/11 2:32 PM
***EX-PARTE*** MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to File Case Under Seal .Document filed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation.(Bartley, Myles) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Redact and File Documents Under Seal, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Myles Bartley in Support of Plaintiff's Sealing Motion, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Complaint (Redacted), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Agreement, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E - Agreement (Redacted), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F - Invoices, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G - Invoices (Redacted), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H - Demand Letter, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I - Demand Letter, | ||
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet Miscellaneous |