Teamsters 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds, by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Roger Taranto, Ross et al v. K&D Aggregates Inc et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip M Halpern |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02751 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.: Delinquent Contributions |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 3:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
Darrell Bjorkland
5 Overhill Road
Cortlandt Manor, NY 10567 |
|
Defendant
K&D Aggregates Inc
5 Overhill Road
Cortlandt Manor, NY 10567 |
|
Plaintiff
Teamsters 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds, by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Roger Taranto, Ross
160 South Central Avenue
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456
160 South Central Avenue
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate of Service Other
Tue 04/16 10:10 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served on Secretary of Labor and Secretary of Treasury on 04/16/2024. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 4:07 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to K&D Aggregates Inc..(jgo) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 4:06 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Darrell Bjorkland..(jgo) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 10:50 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Darrell Bjorkland, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 10:49 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to K&D Aggregates, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 04/12 10:05 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Ernest Kornfeld. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Teamsters 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds, by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Roger Taranto, Ross. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was added separately. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/12 10:09 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/12 10:11 AM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/12 10:11 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 10:12 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel Ernest Kornfeld to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the attorney information was omitted;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 2:41 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Darrell Bjorkland, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds, by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Roger Taranto, Ross, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 2:40 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to K&D Aggregates, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds, by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Roger Taranto, Ross, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/11 2:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Darrell Bjorkland, K&D Aggregates Inc. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29206611)Document filed by Teamsters 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds, by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Roger Taranto, Ross, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Complaint |