KIRCHNER v. LVNV FUNDING LLC
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Bissoon |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00546 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas, AR-24-000510 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 3:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
LVNV FUNDING LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BROOKE KIRCHNER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 04/18 12:55 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by LVNV FUNDING LLC Answer due from LVNV FUNDING LLC on 6/3/2024. (Burnette, Lauren) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Fri 04/12 9:56 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying Sherman Originator, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate by LVNV FUNDING LLC. (Burnette, Lauren) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/12 8:42 AM
ORDER governing procedures for motions filed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. See contents of this filing for instructions. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/12/2024. (jmm) |
|
misc
QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 8:29 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Notice of Removal,. ERROR: Defendant did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 4/19/2024. (jkn) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Notice of Removal (Credit Card Required)
Thu 04/11 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number AR-24-000510. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8211209), filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC. (Burnette, Lauren) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Record, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 04/11 4:09 PM
Judge Cathy Bissoon added. (jkn) |