Nash v. City of Milwaukee et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William E Duffin |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00434 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 2:10 PM CDT |
Defendant
City of Milwaukee
|
|
Defendant
Fire and Police Commission
|
|
Plaintiff
Monica D Nash
3902 Milwaukee St. #W123
Madison, WI 53707 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Transmit Complaint/Notice/Waiver
Fri 04/12 3:56 PM
TRANSMIT Order, Complaint, Notice, Waiver, Consent to US Marshal for service upon defendants City of Milwaukee and Milwaukee Fire and Police Commission. (lz) |
|
4 | 4
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Fri 04/12 2:30 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/12/2024 GRANTING2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. The U.S. Marshals Service shall serve a copy of the complaint, a waiver of service form and/or the summons, and this order upon defendants. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(lz) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/11 1:33 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Monica D Nash. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lz) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Thu 04/11 1:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Monica D Nash. (lz) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Pro Se
Thu 04/11 1:31 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against City of Milwaukee and Fire and Police Commission filed by Monica D Nash. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Jury Demand.(lz) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Sue Letter |