Brooks v. United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC (UWM)
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Aileen M Cannon |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-14107 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 4:07 PM EDT |
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Dallas, TX 75019
|
|
Defendant
United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC (UWM)
|
|
Plaintiff
Leah M. Brooks
representative for LEAH M. BROOKS 5820 33rd Street
Vero Beach, FL 32966 |
|
Plaintiff
Shon A. Brooks
representative for SHON A. BROOKS 5820 33rd St.
Vero Beach, FL 32966 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Tue 04/30 4:04 PM
Amended complaint for permanent injunction, damages and other relief against Nationstar Mortgage LLC, United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC (UWM) filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Shon A. Brooks, Leah M. Brooks.(mee) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/30 4:01 PM
Alias Summons Issued as to United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC (UWM). (mee) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/30 3:57 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Shon A. Brooks, Leah M. Brooks. United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC (UWM) served on 4/15/2024, response/answer due 5/6/2024. (mee) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Compliance
Tue 04/16 9:17 AM
Clerk's Notice of Compliance (copy of order mailed to address listed on order) re9 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, (mee) |
|
9 | 9
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/16 9:14 AM
ORDER DISMISSING SHOTGUN COMPLAINT AND PERMITTING REPLEADING re1 Complaint filed by Shon A. Brooks, Leah M. Brooks, as to1 Complaint. Amended Complaint due by 5/8/2024. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Compliance
Mon 04/15 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Compliance per Order at DE7 , the Clerk has mailed a copy of the Order to the Plaintiff's at the Address listed in the Order. (wce) |
|
7 | 7
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 04/15 10:22 AM
ORDER REQUIRING PRO SE PLAINTIFFS TO CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC FILINGS: It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, on or before May 8, 2024, Plaintiffs shall complete and file with the Court the Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) to receive NEFs form. The CLERK is instructed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiffs at the address listed below. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
6 | 6
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 04/15 10:18 AM
ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES: re1 Complaint. To better manage the orderly progress of the case, it is hereby ORDERED that no Defendant shall file a response or answer until all Defendants in this action have been served. After all Defendants have been served, Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 8:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC, United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC (UWM). (scn) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) to receive Notices of Electronic Filing
Fri 04/12 8:13 AM
Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Leah M. Brooks to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: leahbrooks0912@gmail.com (scn) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee)
Fri 04/12 8:11 AM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 4/11/2024 in the amount of $ 405.00, receipt number 3449 (scn) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/12 8:08 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 8:04 AM
COMPLAINT against Nationstar Mortgage LLC, United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC (UWM). Filing fees $ 405.00, filed by Shon A. Brooks, Leah M. Brooks. (2) Civil Cover Sheet) (scn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits in Support |