Cardenas v. Corporate Client Services LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald M Middlebrooks |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80450 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 4:07 PM EDT |
Defendant
Corporate Client Services LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Erica Cardenas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Sunday, April 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Sun 04/21 11:53 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Erica Cardenas. Corporate Client Services LLC served on 4/17/2024, response/answer due 5/8/2024. (Coleman, Stefan) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 4:58 PM
Summons Issued as to Corporate Client Services LLC. (jas) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 04/11 4:54 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Corporate Client Services LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17441527, filed by Erica Cardenas.(Coleman, Stefan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |