New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joan M Azrack
Referred: Lee G Dunst
Case #: 2:24-cv-02719
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2024
Terminated:May 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 6:23 AM EDT
Petitioner
Adams Abrams
24 Gale Avenue
Seaview, NY 11770
Respondent
Ernest J. Cannava
Administrator Fire Island Vehicle Permits Islip Town Attorney's Office 655 Main St.
Islip, NY 11751
Represented By
Michael P. Walsh
Islip Town Attorney
contact info
Respondent
Anne M. Danziger
Town of Islip Assessor Islip Town Attorney's Office 655 Main St.
Islip, NY 11751
Represented By
Michael P. Walsh
Islip Town Attorney
contact info
Respondent
Anthony Prudenti
Town of Islip Commissioner Islip Town Attorney's Office 655 Main Street
Islip, NY 11751
Represented By
Michael P. Walsh
Islip Town Attorney
contact info
Respondent
Andy Wittman
Town of Islip Receiver of Taxes Islip Town Attorney's Office 655 Main St.
Islip, NY 11751
Represented By
Michael P. Walsh
Islip Town Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Respondent
Sonia Taiani
Terminated: 05/03/2024
Central Isliip, NY 11722
Represented By
James H. Knapp
United States Attorneys Office
contact info

GPO May 03 2024
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO FEDERAL DEFENDANT AND ORDER OF REMAND to State Court to Supreme Court of The State of NY, County of Suffolk, case number 6000175/2023. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 5/3/2024. (Civil Case Terminated) (AMF)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 03, 2024
8 8 4 pgs order Order of Remand to State Court Fri 05/03 4:13 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO FEDERAL DEFENDANT AND ORDER OF REMAND to State Court to Supreme Court of The State of NY, County of Suffolk, case number 6000175/2023. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 5/3/2024. (Civil Case Terminated) (AMF)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Fri 05/03 3:07 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst for all further proceedings. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 5/3/2024. (DF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/02 1:46 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Sonia Taiani, Management Analyst Fire Island National Seashore c/o Alexci [sic] Romero as Superintendent Fire Island National Seashore and ORDER OF REMAND by Sonia Taiani (Knapp, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
5 5 misc State Court Record Tue 04/23 4:27 PM
STATE COURT RECORD Received from Suffolk County Clerk re E-filed Supreme Court case, Index #600175/2023. (LC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
4 4 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/18 10:40 AM
INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference via Zoom will be held on May 29, 2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. All parties must attend. Pro Se Plaintiff is directed to contact Judge Wicks' Courtroom Deputy at (631) 712-5625 with an email address where the Zoom invitation can be sent. The parties are directed to complete the attached Proposed 26(f) Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than May 22, 2024 . Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. This conference is a public proceeding, and all are welcome to attend via telephone or via video. If you would like to receive the Zoom invitation, please contact Judge Wicks' Courtroom Deputy at (631) 712-5625. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 4/18/2024. (DF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order,
Att: 2 JMW Individual Practice Rules,
Att: 3 Hofstra Legal Pro Se Assistance Program
Friday, April 12, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation Fri 04/12 2:11 PM
Notice of Related Case: The Case was directly assigned as a related Pro Se/Habeas Case. 24-CV-1178-JMA-JMW (CL)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 04/12 2:05 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CL)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 04/12 1:51 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (CL)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/12 2:04 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/11 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sonia Taiani from Suffolk County Supreme Court, case number 600175/2023. (Knapp, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Certification of Scope of Employment,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet