Chang v. Buzzfeed, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02753 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 4:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
Buzzfeed, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Chih-Yuan Chang
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 2:59 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Buzzfeed, Inc. served on 4/15/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. Service was accepted by Carlos Bobe, Registered Agent. Document filed by Chih-Yuan Chang..(Kopel, Yitzchak) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 04/16 3:57 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on June 21, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Unless the parties request otherwise, the Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Initial Conference set for 6/21/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/16/2024) (ate) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 10:34 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Buzzfeed, Inc...(jgo) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 04/12 10:29 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Yitzchak Kopel. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/12 10:31 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/12 10:32 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/12 10:33 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 3:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buzzfeed, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Chih-Yuan Chang..(Kopel, Yitzchak) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/11 3:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kopel, Yitzchak) |
|
1 | 1
28
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-29207067)Document filed by Chih-Yuan Chang..(Kopel, Yitzchak) |