California Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Mendez
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:24-cv-01093
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2024
Case in other court:Sacramento County Superior Court, 24CV004634
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 3:09 AM PDT
Defendant
AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By
Victoria Weatherford
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Defendant
Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Victoria Weatherford
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Paul M.M. Willison, PHV
contact info
Kevin P. Zimmerman, PHV
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Victoria Weatherford
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Ali I. Haque, PHV
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Paul M.M. Willison, PHV
contact info
Kevin P. Zimmerman, PHV
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Victoria Weatherford
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Ali I. Haque, PHV
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nazia Jabeen Iqbal
1401 Arena Drive
Davis, CA 95618
Plaintiff
Muhammad Younas Malik
1401 Arena Drive
Davis, CA 95618

GPO Apr 29 2024
attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Clemente Licea, O)ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/26/2024 GRANTING 6 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Paul M.M. Willison, PHV for Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. The Pro Hac Vice
GPO Apr 29 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/26/2024 GRANTING 7 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Ali I. Haque, PHV for Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Clemente Licea, O)
GPO Apr 29 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/26/2024 GRANTING 8 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Kevin P. Zimmerman, PHV for Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Clemente Licea, O)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 27, 2025
37 37 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Stayed Findings and Recommendations Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Stay Thu 02/27 10:15 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 02/26/25 ADOPTING36 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING11 Motion to Compel and Plaintiff Malik is compelled to arbitrate his claims; GRANTING14 Motion to Stay and this case is STAYED pending arbitration of Malik's claims; and DENYING13 Motion for a Show Cause Order without prejudice. This matter is REFERRED BACK to the assigned Magistrate Judge for all further pretrial matters. (Deputy Clerk KML)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 02/27 10:15 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:37 Order served on Nazia Jabeen Iqbal, Muhammad Younas Malik. (Deputy Clerk KML)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
36 36 motion Findings and Recommendations Tue 02/04 11:31 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 02/04/25 RECOMMENDING that11 Motion to Compel be granted, and plaintiff Malik be compelled to arbitrate his claims;14 Motion to Stay be granted, and this case be stayed pending arbitration of Malik's claims; and13 Motion for a show cause order be denied, without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Deputy Clerk KML)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
35 35 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 06/03 2:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy N. Cannarozzi for Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 6/3/2024: Defendants' Motions to14 Stay, for an13 Order to Show Cause and to11 Compel Arbitration and Dismiss are ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). The 6/6/2024 hearing date is VACATED. If the court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text only entry)(Cannarozzi, N)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Mon 06/03 2:23 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 35 Minute Order served on Nazia Jabeen Iqbal and Muhammad Younas Malik. (Cannarozzi, N)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/16 2:05 PM
REPLY by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company to RESPONSE to13 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
33 33 service Certificate / Proof of Service Thu 05/16 1:48 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company re32 Reply to Response to Motion. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/16 1:33 PM
REPLY by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company to RESPONSE to11 Motion to Compel,. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
31 31 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 05/09 12:55 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
30 30 respm Opposition to Motion Wed 05/08 8:15 AM
OPPOSITION to14 Motion to Stay,13 Motion For Order to Show Cause,11 Motion to Compel by Nazia Jabeen Iqbal, Muhammad Younas Malik. (Kyono, V)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/29 9:34 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/26/2024 GRANTING8 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Kevin P. Zimmerman, PHV for Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Clemente Licea, O)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/29 9:31 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/26/2024 GRANTING7 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Ali I. Haque, PHV for Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Clemente Licea, O)
Related: [-]
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/29 9:27 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/26/2024 GRANTING6 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Paul M.M. Willison, PHV for Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Clemente Licea, O)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Mon 04/29 9:35 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:27 ,28 , &29 Order served on Nazia Jabeen Iqbal, Muhammad Younas Malik. (Clemente Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
26 26 service Certificate / Proof of Service Tue 04/23 3:27 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company re23 Notice to Reschedule Hearing on Motion,24 Notice to Reschedule Hearing on Motion,25 Notice to Reschedule Hearing on Motion. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice to Reschedule Motion Hearing Tue 04/23 3:22 PM
NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on14 Motion to Stay, : Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice to Reschedule Motion Hearing Tue 04/23 3:16 PM
NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on13 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, : Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice to Reschedule Motion Hearing Tue 04/23 3:10 PM
NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on11 Motion to Compel, : Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 04/23 8:28 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 04/22/24 RELATING cases 2:22-cv-2022-JAM-JDP and 2:24-cv-1093 DJC-CKD (PS). This related case is REASSIGNED to Senior District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson for all further proceedings; any dates currently set in this case are VACATED District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney are no longer assigned to case. The case number on all future filings shall be: 2:24-cv-1093-JAM-JDP (PS) (cc: DJC, CKD). (Nair, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
20 20 notice Notice to Reschedule Motion Hearing Fri 04/19 3:04 PM
NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on14 Motion to Stay, : Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice to Reschedule Motion Hearing Fri 04/19 3:02 PM
NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on13 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, : Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice to Reschedule Motion Hearing Fri 04/19 2:59 PM
NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on11 Motion to Compel,, : Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
21 21 service Certificate / Proof of Service Fri 04/19 3:16 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company re20 Notice to Reschedule Hearing on Motion,19 Notice to Reschedule Hearing on Motion,18 Notice to Reschedule Hearing on Motion. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 04/18 4:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 4/18/2024: Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration, ECF No.11 , Motion for Order to Show Cause, ECF No.13 , and Motion to Stay, ECF No.14 as filed, are defective. To wit, actions in which all plaintiffs or defendants are proceeding in propria persona, including dispositive and non-dispositive motions and matters, shall be performed by a Magistrate Judge. See E.D. Cal. L.R. 302(c)(21). Accordingly, the hearing on Defendants' motions, set for 6/6/2024, is VACATED. Defendants shall re-notice their motion for hearing before the assigned Magistrate Judge in accordance with the Local Rules of Court and the Magistrate Judge's procedures forthwith. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate / Proof of Service Thu 04/18 1:00 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company re14 MOTION to STAY,13 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to why Plaintiffs' Claims should not be Dismissed for Noncompliance with a Court Order,12 Request for Judicial Notice,11 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff Muhammad Younas Malik's Claims . (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stay Thu 04/18 12:49 PM
MOTION to STAY by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta.(Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Stay Claims of Nazia Jabeen Iqbal
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/18 12:44 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to why Plaintiffs' Claims should not be Dismissed for Noncompliance with a Court Order by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta.(Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Show Cause as to why Plaintiffs' Claims should not be Dismissed For Noncompliance with a Court
12 12 respm Request for Judicial Notice Thu 04/18 12:35 PM
REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company in re11 Motion to Compel,,.(Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
11 11 motion Compel Thu 04/18 12:29 PM
MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff Muhammad Younas Malik's Claims by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta.(Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff Muhammad Younas Malik's Claims
service Service by Mail Thu 04/18 4:45 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 16 Minute Order served on Nazia Jabeen Iqbal, Muhammad Younas Malik. (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
10 10 misc Response Thu 04/18 8:13 AM
RESPONSE by Muhammad Younas Malik to3 Notice of Related Case(s). (Murphy, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
9 9 service Certificate / Proof of Service Fri 04/12 9:58 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company re2 Civil New Case Documents for DJC. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
8 8 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Thu 04/11 2:44 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for attorney Kevin P. Zimmerman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11462817) (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Thu 04/11 2:37 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for attorney Ali I. Haque to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11462778) (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Thu 04/11 2:27 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for attorney Paul M.M. Willison to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11462735) (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
5 5 respm Request for Judicial Notice Thu 04/11 12:11 PM
REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/11 12:01 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Related Case Thu 04/11 11:45 AM
NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:22-cv-02022-JAM-JDP by All Defendants. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil New Case Documents for DJC Thu 04/11 11:16 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/11 10:31 AM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 24CV004634 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11461763) (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet