Dean Street Condominium Association, Inc. v. Wright National Flood Insurance Company et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Sheri Polster Chappell |
Referred: | Kyle C Dudek |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00330 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 42:4072 Payment of Flood Insurance Claim |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:15 PM EDT |
Defendant
Attorney Mark Boyle
Boyle, Leonard & Anderson, P.A. 9111 W. College Pointe Dr.
Fort Myers, FL 33919 |
|
Defendant
Attorney Anna Kegelmeyer
Boyle, Leonard & Anderson, P.A. 9111 W. College Pointe Dr.
Fort Myers, FL 33919 |
|
Defendant
Wright National Flood Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Dean Street Condominium Association, Inc.
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/02 11:13 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wright National Flood Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Brown & Brown, Inc., Other Affiliate The Wright Insurance Group, LLC for Wright National Flood Insurance Company. (Morgan, Joel) Modified text on 5/2/2024 (AM) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order to Strike
Thu 05/02 10:08 AM
ENDORSED ORDER. Local Rule 3.03 requires that each party file a disclosure statement using the standard form from the clerk or the court's website. However, in filing Defendant's disclosures, Defendant used an outdated form. As such, the paper is deemed stricken, and the clerk is directed to delete Doc. 10 from the CM/ECF docket. By 14 days from this order, Defendant must refile the disclosure using the proper form, which can be found at: https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/form/disclosure-statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 5/2/2024. (BLW) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 05/01 12:15 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Given the parties' agreement, and otherwise finding good cause, Wright National Flood Insurance Company must respond to the complaint by 6/6/24. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 5/1/2024. (BLW) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/01 11:02 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wright National Flood Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Brown & Brown, Inc., Other Affiliate The Wright Insurance Group, LLC for Wright National Flood Insurance Company.. (Morgan, Joel) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Wed 05/01 11:01 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. (Morgan, Joel) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Protective Order
Mon 04/15 11:26 AM
HURRICANE IAN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER which is referenced in and hereby attached to the 7 Case Management Scheduling Order (Hurricane Ian). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 4/15/2024. (CGW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A. | ||
7 | 7
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Mon 04/15 11:25 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER (HURRICANE IAN): See Order for dates and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 4/15/2024. (CGW) |
|
6 | 6
order
Civil Action Order
Mon 04/15 11:22 AM
CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/15/2024. (CGW) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 04/15 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Mark A. Boyle, Sr on behalf of Dean Street Condominium Association, Inc. Lead Counsel: Mark A. Boyle. (Boyle, Mark) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Mon 04/15 10:03 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Wright National Flood Insurance Company. (EVK) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/15 9:40 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Mark A. Boyle, Sr., Anna Kelly Kegelmeyer, I of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/12 1:47 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:24-cv-330-SPC-KCD. (TNP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 12:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Wright National Flood Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21976822) filed by Dean Street Condominium Association, Inc..(Boyle, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Composite Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Composite Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons Summons |