Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Charles R Simpson, III
Referred: Colin H Lindsay
Case #: 3:24-cv-00231
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2024
Case in other court:Jefferson Circuit Court, 24-CI-001596
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 6:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Dakkota Integrated Systems, LLC
Represented By
Blythe McGregor
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Ryan M. Martin
Jackson Lewis Pc - Cincinnati
contact info
Plaintiff
Beau Hidbrader
Represented By
Thomas Robert Coffey
Morgan Pottinger Mcgarvey - Louisville
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, October 18, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/18 9:19 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Beau Hidbrader. (Coffey, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
12 12 misc Report of Mediation Thu 10/17 2:48 PM
MEDIATOR'S REPORT TO THE COURT by Ann O'Malley Shake. (DJT)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Order Mon 07/29 4:22 PM
SCHEDULING ON REPORT OF PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING and REFERRAL ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 7/29/24 : Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 8/29/2024. Discovery due by 3/27/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 5/27/2025. Exhibit List due by 10/30/2025. Expert Discovery due by 6/26/2025. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 4/29/2025. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 2/27/2025. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 7/29/2024. Witness List due by 10/30/2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby REFERRED to Honorable Colin H. Lindsay, United States Magistrate Judge, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and disposition of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. cc: Counsel (DJT)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
10 10 notice Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent Fri 07/26 2:27 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and in accordance with Rule 73(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that a United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or non-jury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. You may consent to have your case referred to a Magistrate Judge, or you may withhold your consent without adverse consequences. Should all parties consent to having a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, please complete the[LINK:Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge] and send a copy of this document to the clerks office via regular mail or email at[LINK:intake-kywECF@kywd.uscourts.gov] . (JAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
9 9 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan) Mon 07/15 1:15 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Dakkota Integrated Systems, LLC. (Martin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order Thu 05/30 1:52 PM
ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT (EBOC) by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 05/30/2024. Joint Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting due by 7/15/2024. cc: Counsel (HMC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
7 7 misc Request for Fee Refund Tue 05/21 1:09 PM
Request for Fee Refund re1 Notice of Removal, by Dakkota Integrated Systems, LLC. (Martin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/21 1:36 PM
NOTICE of confirmation as to Ryan Martin re7 Request for Fee Refund (KJA)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) Mon 04/22 8:45 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Rush Group, LLC for Dakkota Integrated Systems, LLC. by Dakkota Integrated Systems, LLC. (Martin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) Mon 04/22 8:34 AM
Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Dakkota Integrated Systems, LLC. (Martin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
4 4 notice Deficiency Thu 04/11 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency re1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: Rule 7.1(a)(1) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Rule 7.1(a)(2) Diversity Disclosure Statement not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/25/2024. (HMC)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/11 4:48 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE to Jefferson Circuit Court and Counsel of Record/Parties re1 Notice of Removal. (HMC)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assignment Thu 04/11 4:41 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (HMC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/11 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Dakkota Integrated Systems, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-001596. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BKYWDC-4012416) (HMC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/11 4:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Dakkota Integrated Systems, LLC (filed in Jefferson Circuit Court - See DN1 - 2). (HMC)
Related: [-]