Casasus v. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd
Florida Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21359 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:14 PM EDT |
Defendant
Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd
|
|
Plaintiff
Emelinda Casasus
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Fri 04/12 7:29 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Case administratively closed - No Initiating Document filed/attached. A second attempt to open a case without incurring a new charge should be made by the next business day, if not - our Financial Department will refund the filing fees within 10 business days. Filing fees will be refunded. Amount $405.00, receipt #AFLSDC-17441613, case filed date: 4/11/2024. No further entries will be made on this case . (bb) |