Purple Innovation, LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21362 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:15 PM EDT |
Defendant
The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
|
|
Plaintiff
Purple Innovation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Tue 04/30 10:14 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a 22 page Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, Transfer of the Defendant Internet Stores, and an Order to Show Cause as to Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 04/30 10:10 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion to Seal. Schedule A to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed under seal and shall remain under seal until further Order of this Court. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Motion to Seal (Public)
Mon 04/29 7:09 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Purple Innovation, LLC. (Baeza, Rossana) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
File Excess Pages
Mon 04/29 7:00 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Purple Innovation, LLC.(Baeza, Rossana) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 6:58 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Purple Innovation, LLC (Baeza, Rossana) |
|
5 | 5
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 04/29 11:59 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER directing Plaintiff to file Schedule A to its Complaint on or before May 3, 2024. Plaintiff may file Schedule A under seal. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
4 | 4
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Mon 04/29 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
30+
pgs
misc
Form AO 120/121
Fri 04/12 9:45 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (amb) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/12 9:40 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 4:33 PM
COMPLAINT against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17441699, filed by Purple Innovation, LLC.(Baeza, Rossana) |
|
Att: 1 23 pgs Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 41 pgs Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |