Tully v. Office of the Commissioner of Baseball d/b/a Major League Baseball et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret M Garnett |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02764 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:15 PM EDT |
Defendant
Major League Baseball Pension Committee
|
|
Defendant
Major League Baseball Supplemental Pension Plan for Office Employees
|
|
Defendant
Office of the Commissioner of Baseball d/b/a Major League Baseball
|
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Tully
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 3:03 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Major League Baseball Pension Committee, Major League Baseball Supplemental Pension Plan for Office Employees, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball..(McGuire, Gina) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 3:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gina Farinella McGuire on behalf of Major League Baseball Pension Committee, Major League Baseball Supplemental Pension Plan for Office Employees, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball..(McGuire, Gina) |
|
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 04/17 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/29/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 4/17/2024) (mml) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/16 11:08 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Major League Baseball Supplemental Pension Plan for Office Employees waiver sent on 4/15/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. Document filed by Christopher Tully..(Kaiser, Daniel) |
|
14 | 14
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/16 11:06 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Major League Baseball Pension Committee waiver sent on 4/15/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. Document filed by Christopher Tully..(Kaiser, Daniel) |
|
13 | 13
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/16 11:04 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Office of the Commissioner of Baseball waiver sent on 4/15/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. Document filed by Christopher Tully..(Kaiser, Daniel) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 3:45 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Major League Baseball Supplemental Pension Plan for Office Employees. (vf) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 3:44 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Major League Baseball Pension Committee. (vf) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 3:44 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Commissioner of Baseball. (vf) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 11:40 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MAJOR LEAGUE BASEBALL SUPPLEMENTAL PENSION PLAN FOR OFFICE EMPLOYEES, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Tully..(Kaiser, Daniel) |
|
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 11:39 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MAJOR LEAGUE BASEBALL PENSION COMMITTEE, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Tully..(Kaiser, Daniel) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 11:38 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OFFICE OF THE COMMISSIONER OF BASEBALL d/b/a MAJOR LEAGUE BASEBALL, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Tully..(Kaiser, Daniel) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 04/12 11:25 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Jordan Kaiser. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/12 11:26 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/12 11:27 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/12 11:28 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 11:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel Jordan Kaiser to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons, 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; all of the party names must be viewable on the PDF case caption. If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
52
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 04/11 6:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Major League Baseball Pension Committee, Major League Baseball Supplemental Pension Plan for Office Employees, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball d/b/a Major League Baseball.Document filed by Christopher Tully. Related document:1 Complaint,..(Kaiser, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 5:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Major League Supplemental Pension Plan for Office Employees, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Tully..(Kaiser, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 5:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Major League Baseball Pension Committee, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Tully..(Kaiser, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 5:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Commissioner of Baseball d/b/a Major League Baseball, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Tully..(Kaiser, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/11 5:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kaiser, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
52
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 5:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Major League Baseball Pension Committee, Major League Baseball Supplemental Pension Plan for Office Employees, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball d/b/a Major League Baseball. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29208307)Document filed by Christopher Tully..(Kaiser, Daniel) |