Hiras et al v. AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Maureen P Kelly |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00550 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Allegheny County, GD-21-014383 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:18 PM EDT |
Defendant
AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE CO.
|
Represented By
|
In Re
Maria Hiras
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Hiras Irrevocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Fri 04/19 1:32 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 5 on or before May 13, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 4/19/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Thu 04/18 4:01 PM
BRIEF in Support re5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6) filed by AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE CO.. (Leahey, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 04/18 3:56 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6) re1 Notice of Removal, by AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE CO.. (Leahey, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Thu 04/18 12:38 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying Defendant is a Texas corporation located in Houston, TX; wholly owned subsidiary of AGC Life Insurance Company; AGC Life Insurance Company is a wholly owned subsidiary of Corebridge Financial, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE CO.. (Leahey, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Errata (to be used by filers)
Fri 04/12 3:40 PM
Errata re1 Notice of Removal, by AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE CO.. Reason for Correction: Civil Cover Sheet missing from Notice of Removal. (Leahey, Michael) |
|
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Fri 04/12 12:40 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Notice of Removal,. ERROR: must have a civil cover sheet. CORRECTION: using eratta event, file a civil cover sheet. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Notice of Removal (Credit Card Required)
Thu 04/11 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-21-014383. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8211777), filed by AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE CO.. (Leahey, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Praecipe for Writ of Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Removal from State Court | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 04/15 1:02 PM
Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (sdp) |