Grato Holdings, Inc. et al v. JB7, LLC
Iowa Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen H Locher |
Referred: | Helen C Adams |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00009 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday May 02, 2024 6:01 AM CDT |
Defendant
JB7, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Energique, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Grato Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/01 3:23 PM
TEXT ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sarah K. Dewar; granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Airina L. Rodrigues. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/1/2024. (btg) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)
Wed 05/01 2:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5447534 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by JB7, LLC. (Dee, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)
Wed 05/01 2:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5447527 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by JB7, LLC. (Dee, Michael) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT
Wed 05/01 2:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by JB7, LLC. (Dee, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/01 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Dee on behalf of JB7, LLC (Dee, Michael) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 3:55 PM
TEXT ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel Walden Roberts. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/18/2024. (nla) |
|
8 | 8
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 1:54 PM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Kosma. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/18/2024. (nla) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/17 10:24 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Grato Holdings, Inc., Energique, Inc.; JB7, LLC waiver served on 4/11/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Long, Scott) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark
Fri 04/12 8:36 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. (nla) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet
Fri 04/12 8:31 AM
Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (nla) |
|
Att: 1 7.1 Packet | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)
Thu 04/11 4:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5429606 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Energique, Inc., Grato Holdings, Inc.. (Long, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)
Thu 04/11 4:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5429599 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Energique, Inc., Grato Holdings, Inc.. (Long, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF
Thu 04/11 4:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Energique, Inc., Grato Holdings, Inc.. (Long, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT against JB7, LLC Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 405, receipt number AIASDC-5429549., filed by Grato Holdings, Inc., Energique, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/10/2024. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/10/2024.(Long, Scott) |