Easter v. Hudson et al
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | John W Lungstrum |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-03052 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)
Thu 05/02 2:00 PM
ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees2 is granted because plaintiff's trust fund account statement shows that he has insufficient funds to pay an initial partial filing fee. Notwithstanding this grant of leave, plaintiff is required to pay the full amount of the filing fee and is hereby assessed $350.00. Plaintiff is required to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to the prisoner's account. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from the prisoner's account to the clerk of the court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the filing fees are paid. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/02/24. Mailed to pro se party Skyler Dean Easter by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Amend Complaint
Wed 05/01 3:04 PM
**TWO-PART FILING FILED IN ERROR. SEE DE7 FOR RESPONSE PORTION** MOTION to Amend Complaint re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Skyler Dean Easter. This is a duplicate filing of DE7 and is being made for administrative purposes only. (jal) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 2, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment 3, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response to Order
Wed 05/01 3:01 PM
**TWO-PART FILING FILED IN ERROR. SEE DE8 FOR MOTION PORTION** RESPONSE by Plaintiff Skyler Dean Easter re6 Order.. (jal) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 2, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment 3, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope | ||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 04/26 9:45 AM
ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc.5 ) is granted. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the NOD is May 31, 2024. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/26/24. Mailed to pro se party Skyler Dean Easter by regular mail. (smnd) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 04/24 2:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time re3 Notice of Deficiency by Plaintiff Skyler Dean Easter. (jal) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 4:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Skyler Dean Easter. (smnd) |
|
Att: 1 Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case
Mon 04/15 8:52 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to pro se party Skyler Dean Easter and Finance Office @ USP-Leavenworth by regular mail. Response deadline 5/15/2024. (smnd) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case
Thu 04/11 4:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Skyler Dean Easter. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (smnd) |
|
Att: 1 Letter to Clerk, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Skyler Dean Easter. (smnd) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Letter to Clerk, | ||
Att: 14 Envelope |