Patureau v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Shelly D Dick |
Referred: | Scott D Johnson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00299 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 19th Judicial District Court, C-742353 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:08 PM CDT |
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Patureau
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/29 8:48 AM
Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (DCB) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/29 8:51 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (DCB) |
||
notice
Notice to Counsel - Consent Declined
Mon 04/29 8:53 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Considering there is no unanimous Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge and pursuant to General Order 2024-02, the Clerk of Court shall randomly assign this matter to a District Judge and the referral judge will be the currently assigned Magistrate Judge. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (DCB) |
||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/26 4:05 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(O'Connor, Darrin) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
90 Day Conference Order
Thu 04/25 2:42 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2024 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/25/2024. (BLR) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
utility
Motion(s) Referred
Fri 04/19 9:05 AM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BLR) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/19 9:38 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings pursuant to Local Rule 7(a). State Farm Fire and Casualty Company responsive pleadings due 5/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/19/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/18 4:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to1 Notice of Removal, by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (O'Connor, Darrin) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate of Interested Persons
Fri 04/12 11:55 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Lauren Williams, Affiliate/Interested Person Gary Patureau, Affiliate/Interested Person James L Bradford, Affiliate/Interested Person Darrin M O'Connor, Affiliate/Interested Person Ashley Haddad, Affiliate/Interested Person State Farm Fire and Casualty Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (O'Connor, Darrin) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel - Appearance of Counsel in Designated Consent Case
Fri 04/12 10:43 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: As previously noticed, this case has been assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment and direct review by the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals. See General Order 2024-02 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. Consent to a Magistrate Judge is voluntary. Any party may decline consent by indicating such on the attached form and emailing, faxing, or mailing the form back to the court as stated herein. The form must be received no later than 14 days from the filing of this notice. DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE THIS FORM. If a party does not return the form by the designated deadline, that party is deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. If any party declines consent, then a district judge will be randomly assigned to the matter. (DCB) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency with LR 7.1
Fri 04/12 9:39 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to1 Notice of Removal. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (JEG) |
||
notice
Notice to Counsel - Initial Designation of Consent Case
Fri 04/12 10:39 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: This case has been assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals. See General Order 2024-02 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. Consent to a Magistrate Judge is voluntary. Any party may decline consent. Once all parties have appeared in this matter, a Consent Form will be noticed to the parties and a deadline set for the form to be returned to the court. The form will not be part of the court record and the identity of any party declining consent will not be communicated to any judge. (DCB) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Complete Case Opening First)
Thu 04/11 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Case Number C-742353. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAMDC-2739182), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(O'Connor, Darrin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet |