6
|
|
6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heather Sertial on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Sertial, Heather)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/16 11:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant must, within two weeks of the date on which Defendant enters an appearance, file on ECF a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this Order (and also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754). If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before the undersigned.If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, within two weeks of the date on which Defendant enters an appearance advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. There will be no adverse consequences if the parties do not consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/16/24) (yv) Modified on 4/16/2024 (yv)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/16 11:49 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/15/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
order
Standing Order re Briefing of Social Security Cases
Fri 04/12 11:40 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE BRIEFING OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 22-MISC-329 Standing Order filed November 21, 2022). WHEREAS, cases filed on and after December 1, 2022 under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), seeking judicial review on the record of final decisions by the Commissioner of Social Security ("Commissioner") denying applications for social security benefits, are governed by the simplified procedures set forth in the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions ("Supplemental Rules" or "Supp. R.");... in order to ensure the efficient disposition of cases subject to the Supplemental Rules, it is hereby ORDERED that, prior to seeking an extension of any deadline set forth in Supp. R. 4, 6, 7, or 8, the party seeking such extension shall attempt to meet and confer with the opposing party in a good faith effort to agree upon a reasonable and comprehensive schedule for all future filings in the case. If the parties reach agreement, the proposed schedule shall be presented to the Court for approval and, if approved, will govern all remaining proceedings in the case.... (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/18/2022) (jgo)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/12 11:38 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/12 11:39 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/12 11:39 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
service
Notice of Commencement of Social Security Action
Fri 04/12 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY ACTION. The Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York are hereby notified of the commencement of this action. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 6/11/2024..(jgo)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/11 5:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fishman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 5:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29208546)Document filed by Paula Bryant Hamilton..(Fishman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
|