Harris Hauling & Trucking, LLC
North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David M Warren |
Case #: | 5:24-bk-01210 |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Harris Hauling & Trucking, LLC
2363 Adams St
Wilmington, NC 28401-7148 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
amdsch
Schedules and Statements
Thu 05/02 10:37 AM
Schedules and Statements - - / Fee Not Required filed by J.M. Cook on behalf of Harris Hauling & Trucking, LLC. (Cook, J.M.) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
order
Extend Time to File Schedules
Thu 04/25 4:17 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules. The time for filing schedules and statements is extended to the date indicated. Any subsequent motions for extension of time may be set for hearing. SO ORDERED by s/David M. Warren. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Incomplete Filings due by 5/1/2024. (Bissette, Amy) |
|
utility
Recommendation Due
Thu 04/25 10:24 AM
RECOMMENDATION DUE: Recommendation due 5/8/2024. (Bissette, Amy) |
||
utility
Recommendation Due
Thu 04/25 10:31 AM
RECOMMENDATION DUE: Recommendation due 5/9/2024. (Bissette, Amy) |
||
badmin
Recommendation re: Motion (No Objection - BA)
Thu 04/25 4:08 PM
Recommendation Regarding Motion (No Objection) [TLA] filed by Kirstin E. Gardner on behalf of Bankruptcy Administrator . (Gardner, Kirstin) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extend Time/Deadlines
Wed 04/24 1:07 PM
Motion to Extend Time for Complying with Local Rule filed by J.M. Cook on behalf of Harris Hauling & Trucking, LLC (Cook, J.M.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extend Time to File Schedules
Wed 04/24 12:51 PM
First Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules filed by J.M. Cook on behalf of Harris Hauling & Trucking, LLC (Cook, J.M.) |
|
18 | 18
4
pgs
motion
Employ
Wed 04/24 12:43 PM
Application to Employ J.M. Cook as Counsel for the Debtor filed by J.M. Cook on behalf of Harris Hauling & Trucking, LLC (Cook, J.M.) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of J.M. Cook | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
badmin
Intake Notice Sent
Wed 04/24 12:07 PM
The Intake Notice has been sent by the Bankruptcy Administrator filed by Kirstin E. Gardner on behalf of Bankruptcy Administrator. (Gardner, Kirstin) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Fri 04/19 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Thu 04/18 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Thu 04/18 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 04/18 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Regarding Administration of Estate (Ch. 11)
Tue 04/16 7:00 AM
Order Regarding Administration of Estate. (adi) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit
Mon 04/15 4:21 PM
Affidavit of Disinterestedness filed by Ciara L. Rogers, Trustee on behalf of Ciara L. Rogers, Trustee. (Rogers, Trustee, Ciara) |
|
11 | 11
order
File Plan & Setting Status Conf. (SubChapter V)
Mon 04/15 3:01 PM
Order to File Plan and Notice of Status Conference (SubChapter V) Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/10/2024. Status hearing to be held on 6/10/2024 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge Warren. . (Donleycott, Sarah) |
|
10 | 10
utility
Calendar - Schedule
Mon 04/15 2:56 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date 11A status conference 11A status conference (Bissette, Amy) |
|
9 | 9
court
Deficiency Notice - Petitions (BNC)
Mon 04/15 2:17 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to J.M. Cook re: Petition. In order for this case to be administered, it is necessary that the following item(s) be filed by the date(s) indicated: The Corporate Ownership Statement was omitted. Schedule A/B. Schedule D. Schedule E/F. Schedule G. Schedule H. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules. Statement of Affairs. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation. Summary of Schedules. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1008, all petitions, lists, schedules, statements, and amendments should be verified or contain an unsworn declaration as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1746. The three day mailing period as provided for under Rule 9006(f), Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, does not apply. Incomplete Filings due by 4/25/2024. Disclosure of Compensation due by 4/25/2024. Summary of Schedules due by 4/25/2024. (Bissette, Amy) |
|
8 | 8
order
Appear for Examination
Mon 04/15 2:06 PM
Order to Appear for Examination (Patricia Hill) . (Bissette, Amy) |
|
7 | 7
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp.)
Mon 04/15 2:02 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/16/2024 at 10:00 AM at Greenville 341 Meeting Room. Last day to file complaint is 7/15/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 8/14/2024. (Bissette, Amy) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
badmin
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee
Mon 04/15 1:25 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee filed by Brian Behr on behalf of Bankruptcy Administrator. (Behr, Brian) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Attorney Statement of Compensation
Thu 04/11 1:27 PM
Attorney Statement of Compensation filed by J.M. Cook on behalf of HARRIS HAULING & TRUCKING, LLC. (Cook, J.M.) |
|
4 | 4
court
Request re: Debtor Electronic Notice
Thu 04/11 1:23 PM
Request to Activate Debtor Electronic Notice filed by J.M. Cook on behalf of HARRIS HAULING & TRUCKING, LLC. (Cook, J.M.) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit
Thu 04/11 1:20 PM
Affidavit of Patricia Hill filed by J.M. Cook on behalf of HARRIS HAULING & TRUCKING, LLC . (Cook, J.M.) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Resolution
Thu 04/11 1:16 PM
Corporate Resolution filed by J.M. Cook on behalf of HARRIS HAULING & TRUCKING, LLC. (Cook, J.M.) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
caseupld
Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 case upload
Thu 04/11 1:06 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed by J.M. Cook of J.M. Cook, P.A. on behalf of HARRIS HAULING & TRUCKING, LLC. (Cook, J.M.) **Corrective Entry: Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition SubChapter V filed by J.M. Cook of J.M. Cook, P.A. on behalf of Harris Hauling & Trucking, LLC** Modified on 4/11/2024 (Gurgone, Christy) |
|
crditcrd
none (ADI)
Thu 04/11 1:28 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-01210 5] ) [caseupld,1032u] (1738.00), Receipt Number A17827504, Amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
utility
Note - CA Assignment (Public)
Thu 04/11 1:24 PM
NOTE: Case manager assigned to case is Amy Bissette (Gurgone, Christy) |
||
utility
Note - DEBN Account
Thu 04/11 2:52 PM
NOTE: DEBN Account(s) Activated (Donnery, Erin) |