Noonan v. Homesite Insurance Company
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Prose |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00981 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Boulder District Court, 24CV030210 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:08 PM MDT |
Defendant
Homesite Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erin Noonan
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Tue 04/23 8:32 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick D. Vellone on behalf of Erin NoonanAttorney Patrick D. Vellone added to party Erin Noonan(pty:pla) (Vellone, Patrick) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Tue 04/23 8:30 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Averil K. Andrews on behalf of Erin NoonanAttorney Averil K. Andrews added to party Erin Noonan(pty:pla) (Andrews, Averil) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/18 9:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Homesite Insurance Company.(Hughes, Shannon) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Fri 04/12 9:57 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 04/12 9:56 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
misc
Order - State Court
Fri 04/12 9:55 AM
STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, by Robert Gunning, District Court Judge, Boulder County, on 04/02/2024. (blaws) |
|
6 | 6
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Fri 04/12 9:53 AM
DECLARATION of Service of Summons, Complaint and Exhibits, Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Homesite Insurance Company on 03/12/2024. (blaws) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 9:52 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Homesite Insurance Company, filed by Erin Noonan. (blaws) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Fri 04/12 9:51 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2
Fri 04/12 9:50 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re:2 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Shannon A. Hughes, Sandy Marie Eloranto . The /s/ signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take: Future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (blaws) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Thu 04/11 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Shannon Hughes by Sandy Marie Eloranto on behalf of Homesite Insurance Company (Eloranto, Sandy) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/11 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Homesite Insurance Company from Boulder District Court, Case Number 24CV030210. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9633376), filed by Homesite Insurance Company.(Eloranto, Sandy) |
|
Att: 1 EX 1, | ||
Att: 2 EX 2, | ||
Att: 3 EX 3, | ||
Att: 4 EX 4, | ||
Att: 5 EX 5, | ||
Att: 6 EX 6, | ||
Att: 7 EX 7, | ||
Att: 8 EX 8, | ||
Att: 9 EX 9, | ||
Att: 10 EX 10, | ||
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet |