Warner v. Warner
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Robert F Rossiter, Jr |
Referred: | Michael D Nelson |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00128 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 6:09 PM CDT |
Defendant
Barbara J. Warner
8759 South Glenview Drive
La Vista, NE 68128 |
|
Plaintiff
Joseph R. Warner
P.O. Box 752
Marlton, NJ 08053 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 04/30 9:58 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Joseph R. DelMaster, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Barbara J. Warner.(DelMaster, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 9:01 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice11 for attorney Joseph R. DelMaster, Jr. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
oth_doc
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 2:47 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5076759 by Attorney Joseph R. DelMaster, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Barbara J. Warner.(DelMaster, Joseph) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
oth_doc
Letter
Mon 04/22 3:22 PM
CORRESPONDENCE on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph R. Warner. (JES) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Reassignment Order
Wed 04/17 7:56 AM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Pursuant to the supervising pro se judges order of April 16, 2024 (Filing No.8 ) and that this case is related to 8:22CV377, this case is reassigned to Chief District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition and assigned to Magistrate Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision.Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (NMW) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Memorandum and Order ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/16 11:23 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER The Court's April 12, 2024, Memorandum and Order, Filing No.5 , is vacated as it was entered in error. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion event at Filing No.2 and issue summons to Plaintiff. Consistent with paragraph 4 of General Order No. 2022 04, Filing No.4 , this case is removed from the pro se docket. The Clerk of the Court shall assign new judges to this case and request a reassignment order from Chief Judge Rossiter. With respect to reassignment, Chief Judge Rossiter is hereby notified that the above captioned case appears to be related to Warner v. Warner, No. 8:22 cv 00377 RFR MDN (D. Neb.), within the meaning of NEGenR 1.4(a)(4)(C). Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LRM) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 11:21 AM
Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Barbara J. Warner. Original summons and one copy mailed to pro se plaintiff. (LRM) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/15 11:54 AM
NOTICE of civil cover sheet on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph R. Warner. (LRM) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Memorandum and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines
Fri 04/12 1:22 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Plaintiff is directed to submit the $405.00 fees to the Clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: May 13, 2024 : Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form) (LRM) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order - Pro Se GO 2022-04
Thu 04/11 2:23 PM
GENERAL ORDER NO. 2022-04: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LRM) |
|
3 | 3
oth_evt
Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)
Thu 04/11 2:22 PM
NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (LRM) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/11 2:20 PM
MOTION for Summons on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph R. Warner.(LRM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Pro Se
Thu 04/11 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Barbara J. Warner filed on behalf of Joseph R. Warner. (LRM) |
|
oth_evt
Filing Fee Paid
Tue 04/16 10:59 AM
FILING FEE PAID on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph R. Warner. Receipt number 8069416, in the amount of $ 405. (JES) |