San Diego Coastkeeper et al v. United States International Boundary and Water Commission et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James E Simmons, Jr |
Referred: | Valerie E Torres |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00663 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 33:1251 Federal Water Pollution Control Act (Clean Water Act) |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 4:01 AM PDT |
Defendant
Maria-Elena Giner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States International Boundary and Water Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Veolia Water North America - West, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
San Diego Coastkeeper
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/30 10:49 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation, San Diego Coastkeeper re2 Summons Issued,1 Complaint,, (Beaudin, Livia) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 04/30 10:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by San Diego Coastkeeper, Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation. United States International Boundary and Water Commission served. (Beaudin, Livia) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order of Judge Transfer
Tue 04/23 9:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jinsook Ohta is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24-cv-00663-JES-VET. (no document attached) (bdc) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lucy Elizabeth Brown on behalf of Maria-Elena Giner, United States International Boundary and Water Commission (Brown, Lucy)Attorney Lucy Elizabeth Brown added to party Maria-Elena Giner(pty:dft), Attorney Lucy Elizabeth Brown added to party United States International Boundary and Water Commission(pty:dft) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 11:17 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by San Diego Coastkeeper. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties.(Beaudin, Livia) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Bienert on behalf of Veolia Water North America - West, LLC (Bienert, Thomas)Attorney Thomas Bienert added to party Veolia Water North America - West, LLC(pty:dft) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca S. Roberts on behalf of Veolia Water North America - West, LLC (Roberts, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca S. Roberts added to party Veolia Water North America - West, LLC(pty:dft) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/17 9:02 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation, as to Veolia Water North America - West, LLC. (Beaudin, Livia) (rxc) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 4:35 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties.(Beaudin, Livia) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Related Case
Tue 04/16 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation, San Diego Coastkeeper of case(s) 3:18-cv-00457-JM-JLB . (Beaudin, Livia) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 3:16 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 2:50 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injuctive Relief and Civil Penalties against Maria-Elena Giner, United States International Boundary and Water Commission, Veolia Water North America - West, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18751459.), filed by San Diego Coastkeeper, Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation. The new case number is 3:24-cv-663-JO-VET. Judge Jinsook Ohta and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres are assigned to the case. (McDonough, Patrick)(axc1) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 |