Hoffman et al v. Bonta
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Ann Bencivengo |
Referred: | Michelle M Pettit |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00664 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983dp Civil Right Denial of Due Process |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:05 PM PDT |
Defendant
Rob Bonta
|
|
Plaintiff
Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher J Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Orrin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Sensiba
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 05/02 7:34 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/1/2024. (anh) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/01 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Nicholas R. Green by Nicholas Reiss Green on behalf of Rob Bonta (Green, Nicholas)Attorney Nicholas Reiss Green added to party Rob Bonta(pty:dft) (anh) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File
Wed 05/01 1:24 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Rob Bonta. (Lopez, Christina) (anh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/01 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Rae Burgart Lopez on behalf of Rob Bonta (Lopez, Christina)Attorney Christina Rae Burgart Lopez added to party Rob Bonta(pty:dft) (anh) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/16 11:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Orrin, Christopher J Hoffman, Jennifer Sensiba, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. Rob Bonta served. (Benbrook, Bradley) (anh) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 2:48 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (stn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 2:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Rob Bonta ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18751966.), filed by Chad Orrin, Christopher J Hoffman, Jennifer Sensiba, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. The new case number is 3:24-cv-664-CAB-MMP. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit are assigned to the case. (Bradley A. Benbrook)(stn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |