California Southern District Court
Judge:Todd W Robinson
Referred: Valerie E Torres
Case #: 3:24-cv-00666
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2024
Terminated:Feb 04, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, San Diego, 37-02023-00029734-CU-PO-NC
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 3:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Does 1 to 50
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Mark McDonald
Murchison & Cumming, LLP
contact info
Christopher Alexander Brown
Murchison & Cumming, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Francisca Padron Martinez
Represented By
James Nelson Dicks
Law Offices Of James N Dicks
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 02/04 2:08 PM
ORDER granting13 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 2/4/2025. (sjt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
14 14 order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/31 9:20 AM
Minute Order Vacating Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). The parties have filed a Joint Motion to Dismiss. Doc. No.13 . Accordingly, the Court hereby VACATES the SDC set for January 31, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on January 31, 2025.(no document attached) (wjb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
13 13 motion Dismiss Thu 01/30 8:30 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Walmart, Inc.. (McDonald, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
12 12 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 12/12 11:04 AM
Minute Order Vacating Status Conference and Setting Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). The parties have filed a Notice of Settlement. Doc. No.11 . Accordingly, the Court hereby VACATES the Status Conference on December 13, 2024 and SETS a telephonic SDC for January 31, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. Only counsel are required to appear. Teleconference information will be provided two days prior to the SDC. The Court will automatically vacate the SDC if the parties file a joint motion to dismiss prior to the SDC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on December 12, 2024.(no document attached) (wjb)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 12/12 8:34 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Walmart, Inc. (McDonald, Christopher) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Fri 09/13 1:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/13/2024 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 3/19/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 11/13/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/4/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Todd W. Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 9/12/2024.(sjt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
9 9 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Case Management Conference Wed 09/11 11:34 AM
Minute Entry for Proceedings Held Before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. The Court held an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference on September 10, 2024. The case did not settle. The Court then held a Case Management Conference. Scheduling order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Michael Dicks) (Defendant Attorney Christopher McDonald) (no document attached)(jam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
8 8 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 09/04 1:13 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McDonald, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
7 7 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/30 9:22 AM
Notice and Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference ("ENE/CMC"). An ENE/CMC is set for September 11, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on July 30, 2024. (wjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 05/10 4:26 PM
ORDER Discharging Order TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 5/10/2024.(sjt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
5 5 respm Response - Other Tue 04/30 2:22 PM
RESPONSE re4 Order to Show Cause AS TO WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by Walmart, Inc.. (McDonald, Christopher) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/16 4:20 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should not be Remanded for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/16/2024.(sjt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/11 4:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (stn)
Related: [-]
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 04/11 4:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Walmart, Inc.. (stn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/11 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18752339.), filed by Walmart, Inc.. The new case number is 3:24-cv-666-TWR-VET. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres are assigned to the case.(stn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Attachments