Woodside Mansion Inc.
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth S Stong |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-41559 |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 23, 2024 |
Debtor
Woodside Mansion Inc.
10553 171st Pl
Jamaica, NY 11433-1749 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Debra Kramer
Debra Kramer, PLLC 10 Pantigo Road Suite 1
East Hampton, NY 11937 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 04/12/2024 12:19 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Thu 04/11 4:13 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:1 24-41559 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B22538880. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 04/11 4:12 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $338 Filed by Lila Ayers on behalf of Woodside Mansion Inc. (Ayers, Lila) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign)
Thu 04/11 5:02 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Business Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee, Kramer, Debra, with 341(a) Meeting to be held on 5/23/2024 at 11:00 AM at Zoom.us/join - Kramer: Meeting ID 421 655 0672, Passcode 6019615054, Phone 1 (631) |