SIDNEYS FIVE LLC
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | David S Jones |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10620 |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 16, 2024 |
Debtor
SIDNEYS FIVE LLC
103 1st Ave
New York, NY 10003-2951 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Deborah Piazza
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP 1350 Broadway 11th Floor
New York, NY 10018 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 04/12/2024 12:03 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 04/11 2:22 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-10620 ) [misc,969] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16584957. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Add Trustee
Thu 04/11 3:10 PM
Trustee Deborah Piazza added to the case. (Ferguson, Frances) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 04/11 1:20 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of SIDNEYS FIVE LLC. (Morrison, Lawrence) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Resolution Pursuant to LR 1074-1
Thu 04/11 1:22 PM
Corporate Resolution Pursuant to LR 1074-1 Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of SIDNEYS FIVE LLC. (Morrison, Lawrence) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Summary of Assets and Liabilities
Thu 04/11 1:31 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules - Non-Individual Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of SIDNEYS FIVE LLC. (Morrison, Lawrence) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Schedules
Thu 04/11 1:33 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of SIDNEYS FIVE LLC. (Morrison, Lawrence) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Official Form 106Dec
Thu 04/11 1:34 PM
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules (Official Form 106Dec) Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of SIDNEYS FIVE LLC. (Morrison, Lawrence) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney For Debtor (Rule 2016(b)) - Form 2030
Thu 04/11 1:35 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney For Debtor (Rule 2016(b))- Form 2030 Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of SIDNEYS FIVE LLC. (Morrison, Lawrence) |
|
7 | 7
misc
341(a) Notice (Chapter 7 Corporation or Partnership) (BNC)
Thu 04/11 4:08 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Deborah Piazza with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/16/2024 at 10:30 AM at Zoom.us - Piazza: Meeting ID 346 116 0283, Passcode 8488495731, Phone 1 (332) 222-3227. (Ferguson, Frances) |