Smith v. lyle et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John P Cronan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02767 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 12:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Fulmar Advisors LTD
|
|
Defendant
james lyle
|
|
Plaintiff
Emily Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 12:16 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fulmar Advisors LTD, James Lyle..(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/12 12:13 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/12 12:14 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/12 12:15 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/11 7:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kurtz, Orin) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 7:11 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Lyle, Fulmar Advisors LTD, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Emily Smith..(Kurtz, Orin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 7:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Fulmar Advisors LTD, james lyle. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29208790)Document filed by Emily Smith..(Kurtz, Orin) |