Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Referred: Ryon M Mccabe
Case #: 9:24-cv-80448
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Terminated:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Halo Biologics LLC
Represented By
Randy Mark Goldberg
contact info
Mediator
Bruce A. Blitman
12447 Aviles Circle
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418
Plaintiff
Comprehensive Medical Services Corp.
Represented By
Ryan M. Sawal
Ayala Law P.A.
contact info
Eduardo Ayala Maura
contact info
Luis F. Quesada
Ayala Law, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Johnson
Represented By
Ryan M. Sawal
Ayala Law P.A.
contact info
Eduardo Ayala Maura
contact info
Luis F. Quesada
Ayala Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
58 58 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 02/27 4:56 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 2/27/2025. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]