Van et al v. Evanston Insurance Company
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80452 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 12:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Evanston Insurance Company
13575 58th Street North Suite 200
Clearwater, FL 33760 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aline Chau
11555 Heron Bay Blvd. Suite 200
Coral Springs, FL 33076 |
|
Plaintiff
Hoan Van
11555 Heron Bay Blvd Suite 200
Coral Springs, FL 33076 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Status Report
Tue 04/23 12:23 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Evanston Insurance Company (Rivero, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 04/22 10:45 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its response or answer to the Complaint by up to and including May 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (tfn) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 04/18 2:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Evanston Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/2/2024.(Rivero, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Wed 04/17 11:12 AM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order of Requirements Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Tue 04/16 11:04 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge United States Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery.., Order of Court-Mandated Requirements in, Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan) |
|
3 | 3
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Tue 04/16 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/12 9:54 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Thu 04/11 6:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17442066, filed by Evanston Insurance Company.(Rivero, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 (Composite), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 |