Matthews v. BLINKEN et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Julie S Sneed |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00684 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 12:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Secretary ANTONY J. BLINKEN
Secretary, U.S. Department of State U.S. Department of State Office of the Legal Adviser 600 19th Street NW., Suite 5.600
Washington, DC 20522 |
|
Defendant
Ambassador (Germany) Amy Gutmann
U.S. Ambassador (Germany) U.S. Department of State Office of the Legal Adviser 600 19th Street NW., Suite 5.600
Washington, DC 20522 |
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Matthews
David Stoller, PA 4445 Conway Rd.
Orlando, FL 32812 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons returned executed as to USA
Mon 04/29 4:54 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Jeremy Matthews. All Defendants.(Stoller, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Service, US Att'y General, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proof of Service, Office of the US Attorney | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons returned executed
Mon 04/29 4:53 PM
RETURN of service executed on 04/23/2024 by Jeremy Matthews as to U.S. Ambassador to Germany.(Stoller, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons Gutmann (Served), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proof of Service, Gutmann | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons returned executed
Mon 04/29 4:51 PM
RETURN of service executed on 04/22/2024 by Jeremy Matthews as to Secretary, U.S. Department of State.(Stoller, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons Blinken (Served), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proof of Service, Blinken | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
15
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/15 3:34 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 4/15/2024. (GNB) |
|
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Sun 04/14 12:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jeremy Matthews. (Stoller, David) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Sun 04/14 12:12 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jeremy Matthews. Related case(s): Yes (Stoller, David) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Sun 04/14 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by David Stoller on behalf of Jeremy Matthews. Lead Counsel: David Stoller. (Stoller, David) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Fri 04/12 3:44 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Anthony Blinken, Amy Gutmann. (EVK) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/12 3:19 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL David Stoller of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/12 1:16 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Julie S. Sneed and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-684-JSS-DCI. (TNP) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 5:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21974769) filed by Jeremy Matthews.(Stoller, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Email Thread with US Consular Office, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Forms, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, Blinken, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, Gutmann |