Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Case #: 1:24-cv-01520
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Terminated:Jul 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Marisel Elizabeth Cruz
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Marisel Elizabeth Cruz
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Terri Robinson
Represented By
Marisel Elizabeth Cruz
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Juliana Di Andrea
Represented By
Jackeline Alexandra Clements
Rosen, Sokol & Clements Immigration Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Pedro Jose Gagliardi
Represented By
Jackeline Alexandra Clements
Rosen, Sokol & Clements Immigration Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, July 26, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 07/26 2:08 PM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs'8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 7/26/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 07/26 2:08 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss Thu 07/25 3:10 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Juliana Di Andrea, Pedro Jose Gagliardi.(Clements, Jackeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 15, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/15 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marisel Elizabeth Cruz on behalf of Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Terri Robinson (Cruz, Marisel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
6 6 service Certificate of Service Wed 06/12 3:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Juliana Di Andrea, Pedro Jose Gagliardi(Clements, Jackeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Mayorkas,
Att: 2 Summons Jaddou,
Att: 3 Summons Robinson
Friday, April 19, 2024
5 5 30+ pgs order Order Fri 04/19 2:14 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 4/19/2024. (sap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
3 3 service Certificate of Service Thu 04/11 4:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Pedro Jose Gagliardi (Clements, Jackeline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/15 8:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Juliana Di Andrea, Pedro Jose Gagliardi (bmr)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 04/11 10:11 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Terri Robinson. (bmr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint for Mandamus Relief Thu 04/11 10:09 AM
COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Pedro Jose Gagliardi, Juliana Di Andrea. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13353296)(bmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appearance of Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit List,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Exhibit H,
Att: 11 Exhibit I,
Att: 12 Exhibit J,
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet