Tisdale v. Atticus Franchise Group et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael L Brown |
Referred: | Walter E Johnson |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01521 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 et seq. Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 12:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Atticus Franchise Group
|
|
Defendant
Michael Tanner
|
|
Plaintiff
Larobert Tisdale
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/01 9:30 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Larobert Tisdale. Atticus Franchise Group waiver mailed on 4/11/2024, answer due 6/10/2024; Michael Tanner waiver mailed on 4/11/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Billips, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Docket Correction
Wed 04/17 8:51 AM
Notification of Docket Correction re3 Electronic Summons Issued. Filing date of electronic summons corrected. (bmr) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 9:28 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Michael Tanner. (bmr) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 9:26 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Atticus Franchise Group. (bmr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 10:47 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Larobert Tisdale. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13353706)(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |