Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Case #: 1:24-cv-01523
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2024
Terminated:May 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 7:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Rochelle Lang
and all other occupants 1955 Bells Ferry Road 1814
Marietta, GA 30066
Plaintiff
Bridge III GA Laurel Hills Preserve LLC
1955 Bells Ferry Rd
Marietta, GA 30066


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
7 7 misc Mail Returned Wed 06/12 5:11 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Marked As: RTS Unable to Forward. Mail sent to Bridge III GA Laurel Hills Preserve LLC re4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,3 Final Report and Recommendation, Order ruling on IFP. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
6 6 misc Letter Wed 05/01 1:43 PM
Letter to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County regarding the remand of this action to their court. (ddm)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Wed 05/01 1:41 PM
ORDER adopting the3 Final Report and Recommendation as the Opinion and Order of this Court and remanding this action to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 05/01/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/01 1:44 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County, Bridge III GA Laurel Hills Preserve LLC, Rochelle Lang re5 Order,6 Letter. (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 05/01 1:50 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/15 9:13 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bridge III GA Laurel Hills Preserve LLC re4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,3 Final Report and Recommendation, Order ruling on IFP. (bmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Thu 04/11 2:48 PM
ORDER for Service of3 Final Report and Recommendation, Order ruling on IFP, by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 4/11/2024. (rsg)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Order ruling on IFP Thu 04/11 2:47 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal. Because it is clear that this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over the removal action, it is further RECOMMENDED that the case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County. The Court GRANTS Defendant Langs application for leave to proceed IFP for the limited purpose of remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 4/11/2024. (rsg)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/11 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Rochelle Lang.(rsg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/11 11:03 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rochelle Lang.(bmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 04/11 11:04 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (bmr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/11 2:49 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Rochelle Lang re3 Final Report and Recommendation, Order ruling on IFP,4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rsg)
Related: [-]