Johnson-Ware v. Walmart et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Boulee |
Referred: | Justin S Anand |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01526 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex) |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 12:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
David Dixon
|
|
Defendant
Scott A Forman
|
|
Defendant
Walmart
|
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Johnson-Ware
645 Charlie Court Apt. 2A
Portage, MI 49007 |
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Mon 04/15 2:15 PM
ORDER for Service of3 Report and Recommendation, Order ruling on IFP, Order Directing Service by Clerk by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 4/15/2024. (nmb) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendation Order ruling on IFP ~Util - Directing Service by Clerk ~Util - Set Submission Deadline
Mon 04/15 2:14 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Scott A. Forman and David Dixon within the2 Complaint, filed by Patricia Johnson-Ware be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff's1 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form, to be completed for Defendant Walmart. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form for Walmart, and to return these forms to the Clerk of Court within 21 days from the entry of this Order. Upon receipt of the forms by the Clerk, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a service waiver package for each Defendant. In the event a Defendant does not return the Waiver of Service form to the Clerk of Court within 35 days following the date the service waiver package was mailed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshal's Service a service package for each Defendant who failed to return the waiver form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 4/15/2024. (nmb) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Patricia Johnson-Ware.(nmb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing Forms Sent
Mon 04/15 2:16 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Patricia Johnson-Ware re3 Report and Recommendation, Order ruling on IFP, Order Directing Service by Clerk,4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. Forms sent to party: USM 285; Summons; Initial Disclosures. (nmb) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/11 2:15 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (gww) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/11 2:14 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patricia Johnson-Ware.(gww) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |