Stewart v. East Point Police Department et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark H Cohen |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01530 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 12:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
East Point Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Franklin Hollie
|
|
Defendant
April Jackson
|
|
Defendant
Arthur Watts
|
|
Plaintiff
Justin Stewart
411 Maxham Rd Unit 400
Austell, GA 30168 |
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Justin Stewart.(dgr) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
4
pgs
order
Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 2:51 PM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge, and SUBMIT the case to the District Judge for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 4/12/2024. (dgr) |
|
utility
Submission to District Judge
Fri 04/12 2:54 PM
Submission of3 Complaint to District Judge Mark H. Cohen for frivolity determination. (dgr) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/12 2:55 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Justin Stewart re2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dgr) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/11 4:09 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Justin Stewart.(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/11 4:11 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (bmr) |