Ratchford et al v. Gasela, Inc.
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Deborah L Boardman |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-01046 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 4:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
Gasela, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Ursula Mayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Zharinova
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mercedes Terrell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alana Marie Souza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claudia Sampedro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Ruiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abigail Ratchford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dessie Pilek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eva Pepaj
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Mortenson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andra Cheri Moreland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Hinton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keeley Rebecca Hazell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Gray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamillette Gaxiola
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iesha Marie Crespo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paola Canas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monica Leigh Burkhardt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Burciaga
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Saturday, April 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Report on Filing Patent/Trademark
Sat 04/20 4:32 PM
Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Golaszewski, John) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 2:39 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Gasela, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2 QC NOTICE: [1-22] AO 120 form attached to1 Complaint filed by Claudia Sampedro, Abigail Ratchford, Mercedes Terrell, Ursula Mayes, Dessie Pilek, Keeley Rebecca Hazell, Danielle Ruiz, Alana Marie Souza, Jessica Hinton, Paola Canas, Tiffany Gray, Monica Leigh Burkhardt, Rachel Mortenson, Eva Pepaj, Andra Cheri Moreland, Jamillette Gaxiola, Jennifer Zharinova, Iesha Marie Crespo, Jessica Burciaga was filed using the incorrect event. **Please refile the AO 120 form under the "Other Documents" category and select the "Report on Filing Patent/Trademark" event. It has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) | |
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/11 2:21 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against GASELA, INC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11195208.), filed by Iesha Marie Crespo, Rachel Mortenson, Danielle Ruiz, Alana Marie Souza, Keeley Rebecca Hazell, Tiffany Gray, ABIGAIL RATCHFORD, MERCEDES TERRELL, Jennifer Zharinova, Jessica Burciaga, Claudia Sampedro, Jamillette Gaxiola, Paola Canas, Jessica Hinton, Dessie Pilek, andra Cheri moreland, Ursula Mayes, MONICA LEIGH BURKHARDT, Eva Pepaj.(Golaszewski, John) Modified on 4/11/2024 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 20 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 21 Summons Summons for Gasela, Inc., | ||
Att: 22 (FILED IN ERROR) AO120 Trademark/Patent Form |