Wensauer v. Columbia Sussex Corporation et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mae A D'Agostino |
Referred: | Miroslav Lovric |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00500 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 1:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
CS Albany Realty, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Columbia Sussex Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Crestview Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cathy I. Wensauer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/01 2:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Together With Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by CS Albany Realty, LLC, Columbia Sussex Corporation, Crestview Management, LLC.(Greystone, Jonathan) |
|
11 | 11
misc
FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/01 2:10 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CS Albany Realty, LLC. (Greystone, Jonathan) |
|
10 | 10
misc
FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/01 2:09 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Columbia Sussex Corporation. (Greystone, Jonathan) |
|
9 | 9
misc
FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/01 2:08 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crestview Management, LLC. (Greystone, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadlines
Mon 04/15 8:27 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the time for Defendants to file an answer to the complaint. Defendants' Answer is due 5/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/15/2024. (amt) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Fri 04/12 3:55 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by CS Albany Realty, LLC, Columbia Sussex Corporation, Crestview Management, LLC submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric. (Greystone, Jonathan) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 11:55 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gamaliel B. Delgado on behalf of Cathy I. Wensauer (Delgado, Gamaliel) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Admission Requirement
Thu 04/11 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Cathy I. Wensauer; Attorney Alexander Bylinkin, Email address is abylinkin@forthepeople.com. Phone number is (917)-344-7032. Admissions due by 4/25/2024. (sbb) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice Regarding Judge D'Agostino Case Disposition Pilot (Text-Only)
Thu 04/11 11:40 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf . (sbb) |
|
3 | 3
misc
G.O. 25 Filing Order
Thu 04/11 11:38 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 5/31/2024 at 01:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/24/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sbb) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Thu 04/11 11:45 AM
***Answer due date updated for CS Albany Realty, LLC answer due 4/17/2024; Columbia Sussex Corporation answer due 4/17/2024; Crestview Management, LLC answer due 4/17/2024. (sbb) |
||
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 04/11 3:08 PM
TEXT NOTICE : The Initial Conference set for 5/31/2024 at 1:00PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, will be held via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc ) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
State Court Complaint
Thu 04/11 11:33 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff(s) in NYS- Albany County Supreme Court. (sbb) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/11 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS - Albany County Supreme Court, case number 902303-24 (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6691112) filed by Crestview Management, LLC, Columbia Sussex Corporation, CS Albany Realty, LLC.(sbb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |