Knight v. Doty et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederick J Scullin, Jr |
Referred: | Therese Wiley Dancks |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-00497 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notification to Superintendent of Filing
Wed 05/01 3:06 PM
Notification to Superintendent of Filing - Provided Superintendent at Woodbourne Correctional Facility with notice of instant action and a copy of Plaintiff's3 Inmate Authorization Form. USDC/NYND Finance Dept notified. (nas, ) |
|
5 | 5
19
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 05/01 3:02 PM
DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. ORDERED that plaintiff's Eighth Amendment excessive force claim and Fourteenth Amendment equal protection claim against defendant Doty SURVIVE sua sponte review and require a response. ORDERED that plaintiff's remaining Section 1983 claims are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue a summons and forward it, along with a copy of the complaint, to the United States Marshal for service upon defendant Doty. The Clerk shall forward a copy of the summons and complaint by electronic mail to the Office of the New York State Attorney General, together with a copy of this Decision and Order. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on May 1, 2024. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Fri 04/26 12:11 PM
Letter from Knight. Copy of docket sheet; pro se manual and local rules provided. (nas ) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Inmate Authorization Form
Thu 04/11 12:25 PM
INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Carl Anthony Knight, Jr. (nas ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/11 12:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carl Anthony Knight, Jr(nas ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, A. Doty filed by Carl Anthony Knight, Jr.(nas ) |
|
Att: 1 cover letter; civil cover sheet; affidavit of service, | ||
Att: 2 envelope |