Coker v. Columbia Insurance Company
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph Dawson, III |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-01768 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday May 25, 2024 6:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Columbia Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael James Coker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Tue 09/03 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Brian S Yost for October 14, 2024; October 29, 2024; November 4, 2024; November 15, 2024; and November 22, 2024 (Yost, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Tue 07/09 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Brian S Yost for July 31 through and including August 2; October 21 through and including October 22; November 25 through and including November 29; December 19 through and including December 31 (Yost, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 05/28 1:10 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Notice of Removal Pltfs Motion to Amend Complaint Response filed by Michael James Coker. (Yost, Brian) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 05/20 2:29 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Columbia Insurance Company.(Crotty, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Emails Between Brian Yost and Austin Hood dated 5/2/2024, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 5/1/2024 Filed Voluntary Dismissal of the NC Action | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/20 12:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Notice of Removal Pltfs Motion to Amend Complaint Response filed by Columbia Insurance Company.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/28/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Crotty, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Original Answer of Unnamed Defendant CIC in NC Action filed 12/28/2023, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Amended Answer of Unnamed Defendant CIC NC Action filed 1/16/2024, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings in NC Action filed 3/18/2024, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Voluntary Dismissal of the NC Action filed 5/1/2024 | ||
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/13 5:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Michael James Coker.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/20/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Yost, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A - Covenant BI, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh B - CNTE PD, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh C - Email Wilkerson to MD 3-27-23, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh D - EMs with Wilkerson PD tender 3-1-23, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh E - Geico Policy Release UIM-BI 3-16-23, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh F - Geico Policy Release UIM-PD 3-16-23, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exh G - EMF Wilkerson Confirm CNTE 3-1-23, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exh H - Not Signed StateFarm BI Release, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exh I - Dec Page CIC 4-6-20, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exh J - StateFarm CNTE PD BI 5-1-24, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exh K NC Case Voluntary Dismissal 5.1.24 | ||
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 05/06 11:52 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Notice of Removal Pltfs Motion to Amend Complaint by Michael James Coker. Response to Motion due by 5/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Yost, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Amended Complaint | ||
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Wed 05/01 3:34 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document1 Notice of Removal. First attachment description: Additional Exhibit to Pltfs Complaint CNTE .(Yost, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Additional Exhibit to Pltfs Complaint/Notice of Removal | ||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/29 2:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Columbia Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 5/13/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Crotty, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Covenant dated 3/16/23, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Complaint in NC Action, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Amended Answer of Unnamed Defendant CIC, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings in NC Action, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Notice of Hearing in NC Action for 5/13/24 | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice and Acknowledgment of Removal
Mon 04/22 3:51 PM
NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Darlington County County.(Crotty, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Filing of Removal | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 04/11 11:27 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Columbia Insurance Company. (lgib, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/11 11:24 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Darlington County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024-CP 16-00191 (filing fee $405 receipt number ASCDC-11699921), filed by Columbia Insurance Company. (lgib, ) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Documents |