Capitana v. City of San Pablo et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas S Hixson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02151 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 1:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
City of San Pablo
|
|
Defendant
J. Gatlin
|
|
Plaintiff
Laura Capitana
537 Jones Street, #3720
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Response ( Non Motion )
Thu 04/25 2:09 PM
RESPONSE re15 Notice (Other) by Laura Capitana. (jml, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 12:20 PM
Summons Issued as to City of San Pablo, J. Gatlin.(cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 USM-285, | ||
Att: 2 USM-285 | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/18 12:17 PM
Notice of Service addresses for defendants by Laura Capitana. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 04/15 12:11 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE: ECF REGISTRATION (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Request for Waiver of Service
Mon 04/15 10:35 AM
Notice of Lawsuit and REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service of a Summons sent to City of San Pablo on April 12, 2024 by Laura Capitana.(cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Waiver | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/15 10:32 AM
PRO SE PARTY'S NOTIFICATION OF INTENT TO E-FILE by Laura Capitana. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 04/11 2:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Requesting Service Addresses for Defendants. (cjl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
10 | 10
adr
ADR Remark
Thu 04/11 2:17 PM
ADR Remark: The ADR Unit is in receipt of the Request for ADR Phone Conference ECF No.7 . We cannot set an ADR Phone Conference until a defendant has appeared. Plaintiff is directed to contact the ADR Unit when there is an appearance by defendant. (af, COURT STAFF) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/11 2:10 PM
ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
Thu 04/11 1:46 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR ONLY filed by Laura Capitana. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Request for ADR Phone Conference
Thu 04/11 1:45 PM
REQUEST for ADR Phone Conference filed by Laura Capitana. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 04/11 1:43 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Laura Capitana. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/11 1:36 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Laura Capitana. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/11 9:11 AM
NOTICE REGARDING RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 04/11 9:10 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 4/11/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/11 9:08 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Laura Capitana. (cjl, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/11/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 9:07 AM
COMPLAINT (with jury demand) (no process) against City of San Pablo, J. Gatlin. Filed by Laura Capitana. Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2024.(cjl, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/11/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |