Rumph v. Lam Research Corporation et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Jeff Armistead |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00630 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Multnomah County Circuit Court, 24CV12436 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 1:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
Lam Research Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sean Pasin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Rumph
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Thu 04/18 3:21 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer8 . Deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Compliant is extended to 5/16/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. (pjg) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
oth_sup
Declaration
Wed 04/17 4:36 PM
Declaration of Megan J. Crowhurst . Filed by All Defendants. (Crowhurst, Megan) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Wed 04/17 4:31 PM
Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Crowhurst, Megan) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
oth_doc
Jury Demand
Tue 04/16 2:44 PM
Demand for Jury Trial by Jason Rumph . Filed by Jason Rumph. (Munsinger, Damien) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Fri 04/12 11:35 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 8/12/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/9/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 9/9/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. (ecp) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
oth_doc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/11 8:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Crowhurst, Megan) |
|
4 | 4
oth_sup
Declaration
Thu 04/11 7:56 PM
Declaration of Sean Pasin . Filed by All Defendants. (Crowhurst, Megan) |
|
3 | 3
oth_sup
Declaration
Thu 04/11 7:51 PM
Declaration of Jill Scoby . Filed by All Defendants. (Crowhurst, Megan) |
|
2 | 2
oth_sup
Declaration
Thu 04/11 7:45 PM
Declaration of Megan J. Crowhurst . Filed by All Defendants. (Crowhurst, Megan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/11 7:42 PM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 24CV12436 from Washington County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9366221 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Lam Research Corporation, Sean Pasin. (Crowhurst, Megan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |