Maxwell v. The United States of America et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark H Cohen |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01531 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 4:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
ABC, Co.
|
|
Defendant
Mehdi Syed Abedi
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-5
|
|
Defendant
The United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Maxwell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 04/18 11:44 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet , as to Medhi Abedi. (Barron, Colin) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 04/17 12:31 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet , as to United States of America. (Barron, Colin) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
30+
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/15 1:14 PM
STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/15/24. (lme) |
|
utility
Docket Correction
Mon 04/15 2:37 PM
Notification of Docket Correction re2 Electronic Summons Issued, Summons Issued as to USA. No summons was issued as to U.S. Attorney General. Docket text has been corrected. (bmr) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 04/12 1:54 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Mehdi Syed Abedi, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Summons for Mehdi Abedi | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 9:07 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Anthony Maxwell. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13355424)(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Federal AL - SF 95, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit AL Cert Delivered, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Letter from GSA, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit DOJ - Not Correct Dept, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Form 95 to DC Delivery Confirmation, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |