Gertz v. Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02772 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:215fl FLSA: Prohibited Acts |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 9:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc.
One Gustave L. Levy Place
New York, NY 10029 |
|
Defendant
The Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai
One Gustave L. Levy Place
New York, NY 10029 |
|
Plaintiff
Lori Gertz
704 Stratford Drive
Encinitas, CA 92024 |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/18 3:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai waiver sent on 4/17/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. Document filed by Lori Gertz..(Wolfer, Nicole) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/18 3:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc. waiver sent on 4/17/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. Document filed by Lori Gertz..(Wolfer, Nicole) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 12:06 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai. (vf) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 12:00 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc. (vf) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 11:58 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc., The Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai. (vf) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/16 4:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lori Gertz..(Wolfer, Nicole) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/16 4:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE MOUNT SINAI HOSPITALS GROUP, INC., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lori Gertz..(Wolfer, Nicole) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/16 3:55 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to he Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc. and The Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lori Gertz..(Wolfer, Nicole) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/16 2:15 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nicole Wolfer to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): ECF Docket Entry Error. Enter the party name as to whom summons is issued for when prompted in ECF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/15 11:13 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lori Gertz..(Wolfer, Nicole) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 10:58 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wolfer, Nicole) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 9:39 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Nicole Wolfer. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 04/15 9:40 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicole Wolfer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/15 9:44 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/15 9:46 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 9:46 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/15 9:48 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nicole Wolfer to RE-FILE Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney; the PDF must be filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/12 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Patrick Hilferty on behalf of Lori Gertz..(Hilferty, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 10:12 AM
COMPLAINT against Mount Sinai Hospitals Group, Inc., The Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29210238)Document filed by Lori Gertz..(Wolfer, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Summons |