DUDA v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Loren L Alikhan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01048 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 10:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
|
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
|
|
Plaintiff
KELLY DUDA
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
Mon 04/22 4:19 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 4/18/2024; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/18/2024, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/18/24., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/18/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/18/2024.)(Townsend, KatieLynn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit of Proof of Service | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Fri 04/12 3:47 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zed) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 10:14 AM
COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10823572) filed by KELLY DUDA.(Townsend, KatieLynn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/12 3:43 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Loren L. AliKhan. (zed) |