NYC Alliance Group, LLC v. Color Tree Group, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon S Broderick |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02774 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 10:07 AM EDT |
All Defendants
Color Tree Group, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
NYC Alliance Group, LLC
1411 BROADWAY 15th Floor
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/16 4:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Color Tree Group, LLC waiver sent on 4/15/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. Document filed by NYC Alliance Group, LLC..(Faust, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 9:58 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Color Tree Group, LLC..(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/15 9:56 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/15 9:57 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 9:57 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 9:56 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Color Tree Group, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by NYC Alliance Group, LLC..(Faust, Jonathan) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 9:51 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faust, Jonathan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 9:48 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by NYC Alliance Group, LLC..(Faust, Jonathan) |
|
1 | 1
22
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 9:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Color Tree Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29209951)Document filed by NYC Alliance Group, LLC..(Faust, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Test Reports |