Cohan v. Hazelnut LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Aileen M Cannon |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80455 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 11:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Hazelnut LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Wed 04/24 4:09 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re5 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Service Date Entered ; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#6]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (drz) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 4:08 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Hazelnut LLC served on 4/18/2024, response/answer due 5/9/2024. (for Image See DE5 ) (drz) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 3:52 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Hazelnut LLC served on 4/18/2022, response/answer due 5/9/2022. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 11:24 AM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 11:28 AM
Summons Issued as to Hazelnut LLC. (wce) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/12 11:26 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 10:24 AM
COMPLAINT against Hazelnut LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17443022, filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |