Yifan Shipping (Thailand) Co., Ltd. v. Inxeption Corporation
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Greg N Stivers |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00232 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 11:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Inxeption Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Yifan Shipping (Thailand) Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
utility
Set Answer Date
Tue 04/30 8:55 AM
***Answer Date Set to: 5/14/2024. Incorrect service date used when filing DN12 . (TJD) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/29 1:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yifan Shipping (Thailand) Co., Ltd.. (Rogers, B.) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/29 1:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yifan Shipping (Thailand) Co., Ltd.. Inxeption Corporation served on 4/18/2024, answer due 5/9/2024. (Rogers, B.) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 5:06 PM
Summonses Issued as to Inxeption Corporation. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (TJD) |
|
Att: 1 Summons 2 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/15 2:50 PM
NOTICE by Yifan Shipping (Thailand) Co., Ltd. (Rogers, B.) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/15 2:48 PM
NOTICE by Yifan Shipping (Thailand) Co., Ltd. (Rogers, B.) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/12 5:17 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/12/2024, granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Henna Ghafoor. cc: Counsel (KDY) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/12 12:45 PM
MOTION for Henna Ghafoor to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4012911. by Plaintiff Yifan Shipping (Thailand) Co., Ltd. (Rogers, B.) (TJD) |
|
Att: 1 (4/12/2024) Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Deficiency
Fri 04/12 11:24 AM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Henna Ghafoor re1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/29/2024. (KJA) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/12 9:59 AM
NOTICE ON SUMMONS re1 Complaint. (DeW) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Case Assignment
Fri 04/12 9:55 AM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (DeW) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1))
Fri 04/12 9:54 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Yifan Shipping (Thailand) Co., Ltd. (DeW) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2))
Fri 04/12 9:53 AM
Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Yifan Shipping (Thailand) Co., Ltd. (DeW) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 9:52 AM
VERIFIED COMPLAINT filed by Yifan Shipping (Thailand) Co., Ltd. against Inxeption Corporation. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-4012582.) (DeW) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit and Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Summons TENDERED Registered Agent, | ||
Att: 3 Summons TENDERED Corporate Office, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Sheet |