Wilcox v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel J Stewart |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00505 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 9:47 AM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 4/16/2024. (gmd) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner
Fri 04/12 1:00 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Kristina D. Cohn appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 7/11/2024. (Cohn, Kristina) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form
Fri 04/12 9:15 AM
Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12 . Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 5/2/2024. (sbb) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 9:14 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Crystal M. Wilcox (sbb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Social Security Identification Form - [LODGED]
Fri 04/12 9:12 AM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (sbb) |
|
1 | 1
cmpssa
Complaint - Social Security Appeal
Fri 04/12 9:11 AM
COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] .(sbb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Notice of Decision Unfavorable, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |